+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 191, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2140.).
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1772.)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 12, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1370 Chiu By Wiener
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
May 16, 2019: AB 1370 Chiu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 8, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor