+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 1827.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 26, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2013: AB 1364 TING Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
April 9, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor