+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and G.O.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3509.)
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
January 27, 2016: AB 1364 LINDER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
January 11, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor