+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On January 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and ED.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor