+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On September 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bradford.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 9).
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, G.O. and JUD.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 25. Page 1943.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 9, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
July 3, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2019: AB 1360 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 11
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor