+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12).
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1079.)
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3).
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 3, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2019: AB 1357 Quirk Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
April 3, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2019: 19" class="columnField" style="text-align:left"> No Votes Recorded: Dahle
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Quirk
Type:
Primary Sponsor