+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 5, 2015: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor