+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 212, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2682.).
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2130.).
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1485.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 21, 2017: AB 1355 BOCANEGRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 20, 2017: 2
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 20, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1355
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 27, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 11, 2017: AB 1355 BOCANEGRA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2017: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor