+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1987.).
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1729.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
July 16, 2015: Special Consent #5 AB1353 Patterson
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 1, 2015: AB 1353 PATTERSON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 6, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor