+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2562.).
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2117.).
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1442.)
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2015: AB 1350 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 20, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1350 Salas
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 15, 2015: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 14, 2015: AB 1350 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 6, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor