+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2072.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On February 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
On December 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 4
July 2, 2019: [First] hearing set for [07-02-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2019: AB 135 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
March 12, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1