+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 1798.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
July 8, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 19, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2019: AB 1342 Low Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1