+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2920.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.)
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2481.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1884.)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
September 4, 2015: AB 1342 STEINORTH Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
September 3, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1342 Steinorth By Galgiani
- Yeas: 40
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2015: AB 1342 STEINORTH Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor