+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 248, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2662.).
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1891.).
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1409.)
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 22, 2013: AB 1339 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
August 19, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1339 Maienschein By Walters
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 13, 2013: AB 1339 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 7, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor