+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 115, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:40 p.m.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1844.).
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1394.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 3, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1338
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
June 13, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
May 4, 2017: AB 1338 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor