+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1679.).
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.)
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 20, 2019: Special Consent AB1336
- Yeas: 40
June 10, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2019: AB 1336 Smith Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 9, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor