+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 24. Noes 37. Page 1849.).
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24).
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 29).
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2013: AB 1323 MITCHELL Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 37
- Present/NV: 18
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 29, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor