+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 14, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
April 9, 2013: Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor