+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Beall.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9).
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 5. Page 2095.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 19, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 9, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2019: AB 1321 Gipson Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 9
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor