+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on inactive file.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1727.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2013: AB 1318 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading Amend By HAGMAN Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 5
May 29, 2013: AB 1318 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 9, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor