+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and REV. & TAX.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.