+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3144.).
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2577.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1943.)
- Measure version as amended on May 26 corrected.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28).
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2017: AB 1312 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 7, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1312 Gonzalez Fletcher By Skinner
- Yeas: 40
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: AB 1312 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
March 28, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7