+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 506, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3084.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2583.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From special consent calendar.
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1689.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2021: AB 1311 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
September 9, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1311 Wood et al. By McGuire
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 7, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2021: AB 1311 Wood Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 14, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor