+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 457, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2727.).
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 1630.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1308 Cunningham By Jones
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 13, 2019: AB 1308 Cunningham Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
May 8, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor