+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2224.).
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1617.).
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1261.)
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 29).
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
July 2, 2015: AB 1308 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 5
June 25, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1308 Perea By Mendoza
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 4, 2015: AB 1308 PEREA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 4
April 29, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor