+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On September 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6350.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5269.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5065.)
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1727.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.)
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (13)
August 29, 2016: AB 1299 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 1
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1299 Ridley-Thomas By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 39
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 17, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 9
June 17, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services]
- Yeas: 9
June 1, 2015: AB 1299 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 19
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 19
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor