+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3366.)
On January 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On January 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
January 5, 2016: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor