+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2398.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1790.)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 2, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1293 Holden By Pan
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 15
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 13, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
July 13, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
June 2, 2015: AB 1293 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor