+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.)
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1. Page 1690.) (June 28).
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 476.)
On February 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.)
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On January 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 28, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
February 25, 2021: AB 129 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor