+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 287, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6122.).
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5059.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2016: AB 1282 GRAY Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
August 17, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1282 Gray By Hall Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
June 29, 2015: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 14, 2015: AB 1282 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2015: AB 1282 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor