+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 783, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3216.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3195.)
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2314.).
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 1662.)
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (May 24).
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
On January 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2013: AB 128 BRADFORD Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
September 10, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB128 Bradford By De León
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
August 30, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 11, 2013: Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2013: AB 128 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 13
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
March 12, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor