+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 337, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 18.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5380.).
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1656.)
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 31, 2022: AB 1279 Muratsuchi Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 10
August 31, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1279 Muratsuchi et al. By Limón
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
May 27, 2021: AB 1279 Muratsuchi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor