+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
April 17, 2013: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor