+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2017.
On September 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3331.).
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2786.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 2003.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 13, 2017: AB 1274 O'Donnell Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 5
September 12, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1274 O'Donnell By Lara Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
September 12, 2017: 1
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: AB 1274 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 10
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 24, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor