+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1942.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 17, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: AB 1268 REYES Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7