+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 6, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:20 p.m.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 946.).
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1213.).
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Measure version as amended on April 29 corrected.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and NAT. RES.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1267 Hall By Gaines Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2013: AB 1267 HALL Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 10