+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2013: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor