+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1887.).
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1223.)
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 19, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1259 Olsen By Berryhill
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
July 3, 2013: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2013: AB 1259 OLSEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
April 16, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor