+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 1692.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1734.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on C. & C.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
July 15, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
June 1, 2021: AB 1257 Patterson Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 14, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor