+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bloom.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 20).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 14).
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 14, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor