+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1721.)
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2017: AB 1254 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 17, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor