+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Reconsideration refused.
- In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2017: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor