+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 556, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3040.).
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2182.).
On August 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1120.)
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 9, 2013: AB 1252 HEALTH Concurrence in Senate Amendments By PAN
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
September 6, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1252 Committee on HEALTH (Pan) By Monning
- Yeas: 39
June 26, 2013: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 9
April 25, 2013: AB 1252 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 17, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 2, 2013: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Committee on Health
Type:
Primary Sponsor