+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 1774.)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 27).
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and NAT. RES.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2015: AB 1242 GRAY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor