+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 695, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 3146.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 2617.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2346.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Kamlager.
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2345.).
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 12. Page 1831.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- Read first time.
On December 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
On December 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB124 Kamlager et al. By Kamlager
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 8
September 10, 2021: AB 124 Kamlager Concurrence in Senate Amendments By GARCIA, C.
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 9
September 2, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB124 Kamlager et al.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
September 2, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB124 Kamlager et al. Reconsider
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 6, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2021: AB 124 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By GARCIA, C.
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 13
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 20, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2