+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2998.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 2484.).
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4. Page 1722.) (June 29).
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and APPR.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 1827.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20).
- Coauthors revised.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2021: AB 1238 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 5
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1238 Ting et al. By Gonzalez
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 10
July 15, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
June 2, 2021: AB 1238 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 5
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
April 26, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1