+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 22).
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor