+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29).
On July 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2018.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 16).
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 13, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 29, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2019: AB 123 McCarty Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 18
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor