+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On March 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
On February 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 24, 2023: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor