+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 20. Noes 12. Page 5424.)
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 15).
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and PUB. S.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 3426.)
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 20).
On January 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1227 Levine et al. By Hertzberg Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 8
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 15, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
January 31, 2022: AB 1227 Levine Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
January 10, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor